BRIDGWATER AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity number: 1084262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 March 2021 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 27 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required