Dogfen lywodraethu RESTORATION FOR ABUSED PEOPLE (R.A.P)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31ST OCTOBER 2000, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 24TH AUGUST 2001 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 11TH NOVEMBER 2002 AND 12 SEPTEMBER 2004 AND 22 MAY 2009
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE TRUST IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE RELIEF OF NEED AND THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC HEALTH PARTICULARLY AMONGST PEOPLE LIVING IN GREATER LONDON WHO HAVE SUFFERED ABUSE BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND COUNSELLING. TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) BY MONITORING, RAISING AWARENESS OF ABUSE, OBTAINING REDRESS AND RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF ABUSE, PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS, ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS REGIONALLY AND WITH INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY TO ADDRESS ABUSE IN PARTICULAR - SPIRITUAL ABUSE. IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIES OUT ITS OBJECTS.
Maes buddion
GREATER LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.