THE W N MADDOCK SCIENCE SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity makes grants to Caterham School Ltd, in order to fund scholarships awarded to pupils at the School in furtherance of the charitable objectives of the Fund.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 29 June 2001: Standard registration
- 18 October 2021: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 18 October 2021: Funds transferred to 1109508 CATERHAM SCHOOL
No other names
- Investment
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.42k | £16.45k | £24.80k | £7.48k | £11.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.46k | £5.28k | £4.62k | £5.33k | £2.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 28 June 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12TH JUNE 2000
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR 1) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE PUPILS ENTERING OR ALREADY ATTENDING CATERHAM SCHOOL WHO WOULD NOT OTHERWISE HAVE THE MEANS TO DO SO TO STUDY SCIENCE AT CATERHAM SCHOOL AND 2) THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES, EXHIBITIONS OR PRIZES FOR THE STUDY OF SCIENCE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window