ST. ROBERT'S PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1085723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 30 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required