ST. ROBERT'S PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1085723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £10.87k £11.03k £16.46k £11.07k £13.66k
Total expenditure £15.41k £9.94k £16.61k £10.83k £11.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A