BRENTWOOD TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD

Charity number: 1083945
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £6.16k £5.93k £4.60k £3.77k £3.77k
Total expenditure £5.91k £6.61k £4.22k £4.00k £4.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A