Accounts and annual returns THE ACADEMY OF ANCIENT MUSIC

Charity number: 1085485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 08 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 08 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 20 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 04 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 26 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 26 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 18 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 18 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window