Financial history THE ACADEMY OF ANCIENT MUSIC

Charity number: 1085485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £1.10m £1.14m £1.32m £934.14k £756.66k
Total expenditure £1.24m £1.25m £1.38m £1.09m £570.11k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £75.46k
Income - Donations and legacies £290.84k £393.25k £422.85k £384.81k £431.01k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £802.93k £740.70k £891.84k £546.04k £325.34k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.80k £5.41k £6.87k £3.28k £300
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £5.00k £51.22k £18.49k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.19m £1.14m £1.26m £994.24k £480.44k
Expenditure - Raising funds £54.61k £105.49k £120.55k £94.51k £89.68k
Expenditure - Governance £6.07k £0 £6.30k £15.36k £6.65k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0