Financial history THE WILTON AND DISTRICT LINK SCHEME

Charity number: 1084953
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.81k £14.39k £9.95k £11.20k £7.37k
Total expenditure £12.90k £11.00k £10.15k £10.80k £5.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A