SANGAM (THE CONFLUENCE)

Charity number: 1086798
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £116 £3.20k £668 £1.08k £145
Total expenditure £446 £3.06k £622 £974 £18
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A