THE ST MARY'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activities are: The promotion of the Catholic tradition in the Church of England. The relief of poverty in the Third World by the use of technology. The preservation of the environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 July 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Very Rev Dr Peter John Alan Robinson | Chair | 26 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Joyce Sawford | Trustee | 05 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Timothy Garner Smith | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROGER PEGG | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £480 | £1.08m | £20.33k | £27.60k | £29.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.35k | £1.92k | £30.74k | £27.39k | £30.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £1.08m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £263 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £1.08m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £1.92k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £1.92k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 2 MAY 2000
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS OR OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT OR OBJECTS OR OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHICH: 1) MAINTAIN OR PROMOTE THE CATHOLIC TRADITION OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND OR 2) PROMOTE THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND'S TRADITIONAL TEACHING IN OPPOSITION TO THE ORDINATION OF WOMEN TO THE PRIESTHOOD 3) PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE USE OF TECHNOLOGY IN THIRD WORLD 4) PROMOTE ECOLOGY OR THE PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT 5) PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION ACCORDING TO THE STRICT INTERPRETATION OF THE CATHOLIC CREEDS AS TAUGHT BY THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND 6) TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CONGREGATION MEETING FOR RELIGIOUS WORSHIP AT THE CHAPEL OF ST MARY ON THE BRIDGE DERBY 7) TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL NEED CLERGYMEN WHO HAVE SERVED IN THE CHAPEL OF ST MARY ON THE BRIDGE DERBY OR INDIVIDUALS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SAID CHAPEL WHO WISH TO TRAIN FOR HOLY ORDERS AS THE ST MARY'S CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT TO SUPPORT OR ESTABLISH
Area of benefit
ANY PART OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ST MARY'S CHARITY
DERBY CATHEDRAL OFFICES
18-19 IRON GATE
DERBY
DE1 3GP
- Phone:
- 01332 341201
- Email:
- office@stmaryscharity.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window