MEXBOROUGH HIGHWOODS PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1085216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 June 2021 352 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 17 June 2021 718 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 12 September 2018 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required