MEXBOROUGH HIGHWOODS PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1085216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £6.60k £2.04k £1.89k £1.89k £1.14k
Total expenditure £5.84k £3.10k £1.03k £1.03k £1.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A