HULTON ST ANDREWS PARENT, TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1086919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 24 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 26 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 15 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 15 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 10 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required