HULTON ST ANDREWS PARENT, TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1086919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £2.03k £15.95k £8.55k £8.06k £5.14k
Total expenditure £5.26k £16.39k £1.79k £6.35k £9.54k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A