ST MICHAELS ON WYRE CE SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1084659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £6.40k £12.98k £8.42k £17.35k £3.30k
Total expenditure £7.08k £8.25k £7.23k £6.49k £8.83k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A