Accounts and annual returns THE KINGSTEIGNTON VILLAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1085022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 14 August 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 14 August 2021 380 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 14 August 2021 746 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 12 April 2021 987 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 16 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required