Trustees HALIFAX OPPORTUNITIES TRUST
Charity number: 1086183

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE REVEREND CANON HILARY BARBER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Zohaib Ahmed Ali | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shebana Sadiq | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roseanne Marie Sweeney | Trustee | 12 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ambreen Kanwal Qureshi | Trustee | 12 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Leigh Burrows | Trustee | 12 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
SABIR HUSSAIN | Trustee | 12 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aqib Hamid | Trustee | 12 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Gill Rhodes | Trustee | 12 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Pinder | Trustee | 06 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tim Male | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Laura Hunter | Trustee | 21 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jon Craven | Trustee | 21 December 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.