Financial history HARRIS MANCHESTER COLLEGE JCR CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1085769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.23k £4.32k £7.49k £2.04k £3.77k
Total expenditure £6.42k £6.80k £10.20k £3.42k £5.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A