MULTI ARTS ACADEMY

Charity number: 1089993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.12k £185 £423 £1.00k £698
Total expenditure £1.12k £185 £400 £988 £698
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A