RIPON CATHEDRAL DEVELOPMENT CAMPAIGN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity adopted the following strategies: a) To build on the successful events programme by improving the quality and profitability of core events; b) To expand the membership of both Patrons and the Music Custodians whilst delivering the benefits of membership; c) To generate income from appropriate Charitable Trusts and Heritage Organisations; d) To maintain a firm control on costs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 24 May 2001: Standard registration
- 05 January 2024: Funds received from 286488 THE INGLEBY CHARITABLE TRUST
- Ripon Cathedral Development Trust (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mitchel Ingham-Barrow | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard Coad | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Rory Kingsley Wardroper | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Victoria Oldham | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Sarah Ali | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
John Sayer | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Judith Donovan CBE | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
May Christin Thackray | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew James Kitchingman | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
The Very Revd John Dobson | Trustee | 15 June 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £886.55k | £554.01k | £493.04k | £319.35k | £312.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £339.23k | £1.07m | £284.92k | £450.13k | £334.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £713.44k | £540.39k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £13.13k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £173.11k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £294.36k | £1.01m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £44.86k | £62.26k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.04k | £3.15k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £223.30k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £3.15k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 APRIL 2001
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE CATHEDRAL AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
LIBERTY COURTHOUSE
MINSTER ROAD
RIPON
HG4 1QS
- Phone:
- 01765603583
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window