BIRCHMEADOW CENTRE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1085489
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 23 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 23 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 01 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 01 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 19 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 19 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 03 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 03 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 31 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 31 August 2017 On time Download