BIRCHMEADOW CENTRE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1085489
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £33.33k £57.64k £35.91k £28.77k £29.76k
Total expenditure £32.62k £57.13k £32.89k £34.43k £19.77k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k £2.00k N/A N/A £19.43k