BIRCHMEADOW CENTRE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1085489
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Quaker PETER JAMES SMITH Trustee 04 March 2013 None on record
Michael Ernest Bradfield Trustee 30 August 2021 None on record
Laura Kaiser Trustee 04 May 2021 None on record
Margaret Joan DUTTON Trustee 05 May 2013
THE FRIENDLY TRANSPORT SERVICE (SHROPSHIRE) Received: 87 days late
Caroline Emma BAGNALL Chair 18 October 2011 None on record
NATASHA BUNFORD Trustee 29 November 2017 None on record
Simon Benedict MILAN Trustee 18 October 2011 None on record
Barry Arthur WEBB Trustee 04 March 2013 None on record
Dr Ian West Trustee 15 July 2020
ASSOCIATION FOR INDUSTRIAL ARCHAEOLOGY Received: On time