FERNCUMBE YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 1086557
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Working with young people - youth club.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £1,313
Total expenditure: £1,796

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 May 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Dyke Chair 09 May 2018
None on record
Selene Dyke Trustee 09 May 2018
HATTON JOINT ORGANISATIONS
Received: On time
ANDREW PANTER Trustee
None on record
MR TOM BRADLEY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.91k £1.75k £2.15k £2.34k £1.31k
Total expenditure £1.58k £2.45k £2.59k £2.33k £1.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 08 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 21 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Mistletoe Farm
Five Ways Road
Hatton
WARWICK
CV35 7JB
Phone:
01926484304
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available