ST GEORGE'S (HANWORTH) YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 1084708
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 07 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 07 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 30 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 01 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 01 August 2016 On time Download