ST GEORGE'S (HANWORTH) YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 1084708
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £58.79k £61.05k £47.02k £32.86k £66.50k
Total expenditure £45.08k £51.03k £45.23k £57.12k £55.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £14.63k £11.75k £14.50k £14.55k N/A