HARTLEY PRIMARY ACADEMY PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1084730
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 July 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 13 October 2020 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 03 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 20 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 25 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required