HARTLEY PRIMARY ACADEMY PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1084730
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £16.71k £17.82k £23.73k £19.16k £18.67k
Total expenditure £21.65k £7.53k £29.82k £20.52k £14.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A