SOUTH NORMANTON COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS ................................. IN SOUTH NORMANTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNTIED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY ........................... MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; Please see our 'Charitable objects'
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
- Nottinghamshire
- Burkina Faso
- South Africa
Governance
- 29 March 2001: Standard registration
- BUZZ TICKET (Working name)
- CYBER CAFE (Working name)
- LADSNDADS (Working name)
- SNCC (Working name)
- THE FASO FUND (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jared Steven Holmes | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Gutmann | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Comins | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Clare Presland | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Cook | Trustee | 16 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carol Ann King | Trustee | 15 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JAMES KING | Trustee | 02 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £172.12k | £173.75k | £172.81k | £181.52k | £147.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £159.95k | £146.60k | £185.76k | £176.71k | £178.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.88k | £4.15k | £1.88k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 MAY 2000 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATED 4 MARCH 2001
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN SOUTH NORMANTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNTIED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREIN CALLED 'THE TRUSTEES') MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; 2) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK, INCLUDING BY THE PROVISION OF RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION FOR THE RELIEF OF SUCH PERSONS, AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; 3) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE INCLUDING BY MEANS OF ESTABLISHING AND OPERATING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; 4) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASONS OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; 5) TO PROVIDE HELP AND ADVICE TO PERSONS IN NEED IN RELATION TO WELFARE BENEFITS, DEBT AND PERSONAL FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT, ACCOMMODATION AND HOMELESSNESS, THE GAINING AND MAINTAINING OF EMPLOYMENT AND SIMILAR MATTERS IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; 6) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE EXPERIENCING MENTAL OR EMOTIONAL SUFFERING AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS ASSOCIATED THEREWITH, INCLUDING BY MEANS OF PROVIDING ADVICE, COUNSEL, ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT TO SUCH PERSONS IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; 7) THE PROVISION OF PREGNANCY ADVISORY COUNSELLING AND HELP IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Market Street
South Normanton
ALFRETON
DE55 2AB
- Phone:
- 01773687044
- Email:
- admin@sncc.uk.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window