Accounts and annual returns HCT GROUP

Charity number: 1091318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2019 12 August 2020 193 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 12 August 2020 193 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 28 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 27 July 2016 On time Download Open in new window