Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF HOLME HALL SCHOOL

Charity number: 1085085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 July 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 07 September 2020 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 21 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 08 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required