Financial history FRIENDS OF HOLME HALL SCHOOL

Charity number: 1085085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £17.80k £5.42k £7.59k £12.63k £2.86k
Total expenditure £9.51k £12.87k £6.44k £5.68k £6.98k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.97k N/A N/A N/A N/A