TRUST FOR CHERNOBYL CHILDREN (SURREY AND KENT)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Respite holidays in UK for children in Belarus. Support for projects in Belarus to improve the environment for children affected by the aftermath of Chernobyl.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
- Surrey
- Belarus
Governance
- 03 May 2001: Standard registration
- TCC (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YVONNE BURDGE MBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
AMANDA WELLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR JOSEPH MEYER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2016 | 31/01/2017 | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £950 | £921 | £393 | £220 | £228 | |
|
Total expenditure | £560 | £35 | £1.05k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 160 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 160 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 526 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 526 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 891 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 891 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1256 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1256 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 04 January 2021 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 6 APRIL, 2001.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS PARTICULARLY OF CHILDREN AFFECTED BY THE CHERNOBYL DISASTER BY THE PROVISION OF AID AND THE PROVISION OF RECUPERATIVE HOLIDAYS FOR SUCH CHILDREN WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
BELARUS
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 BURTONS FIELD COTTAGES
CROOK ROAD
BRENCHLEY
TONBRIDGE
TN12 7BT
- Phone:
- 01892723610
- Email:
- high.firs@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window