PENZANCE SPORTS INJURY CLINIC

Charity number: 1086580
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 19 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 19 March 2021 353 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 15 May 2019 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 06 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 02 May 2017 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required