FIVE LINKS TURNING POINT

Charity number: 1086067
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 Overdue Overdue by 2287 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Overdue Overdue by 2287 days
Annual return 31 March 2013 Overdue Overdue by 2652 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Overdue Overdue by 2652 days
Annual return 31 March 2012 09 October 2012 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 25 October 2012 On time
Annual return 31 March 2011 18 January 2012 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 14 September 2011 On time
Annual return 31 March 2010 19 October 2010 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 25 October 2010 On time