FIVE LINKS TURNING POINT

Charity number: 1086067
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £46.37k £58.86k £54.78k £53.86k £64.99k
Total expenditure £52.92k £59.44k £56.01k £54.70k £52.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A