The Apostolic Faith Mission UK Ltd

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunday school for all ages Week night Bible study at various centres Weekly prayer meetings Children Programme during Easter and Christmas Youth Club for Christ Annual Youth camp Annual International Camp meeting Musical Concerts Visit to the Homes for the Elderly Homeless Evangelism Counselling Helping the needy and shut-ins
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,113,067
Donations and legacies | £901.72k | |
Charitable activities | £66.41k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £144.95k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£604,785
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £604.79k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £604.79k | |
Retained for future use | £508.28k |
People

1 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Denmark
- France
- Germany
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- Spain
Governance
- 12 July 2001: Standard registration
- THE APOSTOLIC FAITH (Previous name)
- THE APOSTOLIC FAITH MISSION UK (Previous name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Mark Sinaanoda MFANDARAHWA | Chair | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Toyin Olushola Emitola | Trustee | 06 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lazarus Simbanegavi | Trustee | 06 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Francis Olanrewaju Odudu | Trustee | 27 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev MOHAMMED OLATOKUNBO BALOGUN | Trustee | 13 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £725.24k | £685.25k | £819.90k | £934.96k | £1.11m | |
|
Total expenditure | £450.04k | £200.02k | £282.79k | £531.68k | £604.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £572.76k | £621.15k | £731.18k | £768.60k | £901.72k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £55.45k | £7.59k | £2.70k | £48.53k | £66.41k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £97.03k | £56.50k | £86.01k | £117.83k | £144.95k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £450.04k | £200.02k | £282.79k | £531.68k | £604.79k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £4.75k | £5.27k | £6.83k | £6.46k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.97m | £1.99m | £1.65m | £1.61m | £1.96m | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.29m | £1.29m | £2.72m | £2.73m | £3.35m | |
|
Other assets | £2.05m | £2.56m | £2.24m | £2.68m | £2.61m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £14.44k | £57.95k | £30.08k | £34.45k | £40.33k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 JAN 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 MAY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 JUN 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23 JUN 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH ACROSS THE UNITED KINGDOM AND AROUND THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY PROCLAIMING THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACROSS THE UNITED KINGDOM AND EUROPE BY THE SPOKEN WORD, IN PRINT, BY ELECTRONIC MEDIA, BY PERSONAL EVANGELISM AND OTHER EVANGELISTIC ACTIVITIES, WORKING FOR THE SALVATION OF SOULS, RAISING UP AND ORGANISING LOCAL CHURCH CONGREGATIONS, MINISTERING TO EDIFY BELIEVERS, ASSEMBLING PEOPLE TOGETHER TO WORSHIP THE ALMIGHTY GOD FOR MUTUAL ENCOURAGEMENT AND CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP IN JESUS CHRIST AND ANY OTHER PROJECTS OR INITIATIVES WHICH FURTHER THE PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH OR PERSONAL EVANGELISM ; AND TO CARRY OUT SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES, PUT INTO PRACTICE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE, PROVIDED THAT THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH PURPOSES MUST BE UNDERTAKEN IN A MANNER THAT IS CONSISTENT WITH ANY DOCTRINAL DISTINCTIVES AND ETHICAL STATEMENTS AS MAY BE ADOPTED AND AMENDED BY THE CHARITY FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE, AND LONDON IN PARTICULAR
Contact information
- Address:
-
Apostolic Faith Mission Uk
13 Penhill Road
BEXLEY
Kent
DA5 3EP
- Phone:
- 02076398897
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window