BATHWICK ST MARY CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1096529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required