BATHWICK ST MARY CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1096529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julia Brownbridge Trustee 26 March 2007 None on record
Michael Craine Trustee 20 January 2021 None on record
Rev PETER EDWARDS Trustee 10 January 2014
CONFRATERNITY OF THE BLESSED SACRAMENT Received: On time
Lucy Spedo Mirandola Trustee 02 November 2017 None on record
Nick Fiennes Trustee 16 June 2016 None on record