Love Praise Church Of Christ

Charity number: 1088177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 November 2020 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required