Financial history THE CENTRE FOR ENVIROMENTAL INITIATIVES

Charity number: 1087782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £124.54k £285.11k £110.97k £83.82k £63.79k
Total expenditure £122.98k £115.79k £124.39k £125.25k £81.46k
Income from government contracts £19.65k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £2.19k £5.13k £4.34k £10.00k