THE EUROPEAN ASSOCIATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity number: 1085157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides funding to not-for-profit organisations overseas that are promoting the activities of Jehovah's Witnesses. Considers and responds to threats or apparent threats to religious freedom, principally in Europe.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £166

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 February 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE EUROPEAN ASSOCIATION OF JEHOVAH'S CHRISTIAN WITNESSES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Schofield Trustee 28 April 2023
None on record
BRETT GARDNER Trustee 04 April 2016
None on record
ORLANDO ZENI Trustee 04 April 2016
None on record
Mark Armistead Trustee 04 April 2016
None on record
Richard John Cook Trustee 04 April 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £19 £0 £0 £1.39k £0
Total expenditure £1.96k £540 £93 £1.47k £166
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 14 June 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 15 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 10 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 Kingdom Way
West Hanningfield
CHELMSFORD
CM2 8FW
Phone:
02089062211
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available