ALTERNATIVES TO VIOLENCE PROJECT, BRITAIN

Charity number: 1085709
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £73.62k £135.21k £108.76k £127.47k £85.20k
Total expenditure £102.44k £135.50k £116.40k £113.38k £103.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A