ALTERNATIVES TO VIOLENCE PROJECT, BRITAIN

Charity number: 1085709
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Colin Richard Mallinson Trustee 25 September 2016 None on record
STEPHEN JAMES CHARMAN Chair 07 November 2020 None on record
Alexandra Dzhuras-Dotta Trustee 12 January 2019 None on record
Daniel Robert Rann Trustee 12 June 2021 None on record
Marie Anne Walsh Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
Robin Leckie Marshall Trustee 12 June 2021 None on record
HAROLD JAMES ALBRIGHT Trustee 07 November 2020 None on record
JENNIFER KATE HAWKSWOOD Trustee 07 November 2020 None on record
Catherine Marion Potvin Trustee 12 June 2021 None on record