Cambridge Castle Townswomen's Guild

Charity number: 1085276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JUDIE COUSINS Trustee None on record
CAROLINE ROSEMARY HATTERSLEY WILSON Trustee 01 February 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL BENEFICE OF THE ASCENSION, CAMBRIDGE (ST. GILES WITH ST. PETER, ST. LUKE AND ST. AUGUSTINE) Received: On time
Pauline Anne Nunn Trustee 07 March 2017 None on record
DIANA HAWKINS Trustee None on record
ANN ELIZABETH GALE Trustee 02 March 2016 None on record
MURIEL SHEILA SMITH Trustee 09 December 2011 None on record
Karina Cleland Chair 05 July 2021 None on record
MARGARET SPENCER-THOMAS Trustee 02 May 2013 None on record
MARY ELIZABETH HOLLAND Trustee 02 May 2013 None on record