Financial history WAKEFIELD DISTRICT BADGER GROUP

Charity number: 1089308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £840 £448 £593 £17.05k £408
Total expenditure £1.27k £539 £408 £751 £266
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A