Financial history BARN HILL CONSERVATION GROUP

Charity number: 1085476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £3.41k £2.33k £3.44k £4.75k £58.02k
Total expenditure £2.97k £3.06k £6.46k £8.08k £38.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £54.75k