Trustees RICHMOND CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX SERVICE

Charity number: 1085878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Guy Easthaugh Trustee 11 April 2024
None on record
Lollie Tuckey Trustee 15 November 2023
None on record
Rakhi Govil Trustee 18 October 2023
None on record
Nigel Brown Trustee 11 March 2023
None on record
Sarah Hynes Trustee 11 March 2023
None on record
Annie Carpenter Trustee 16 November 2022
None on record
Owain Griffiths Trustee 03 August 2022
None on record
John Wheatle Trustee 03 August 2022
None on record
Wendy Barker Trustee 27 January 2021
None on record
Roger Keith Hillyer Trustee 21 December 2020
THE FRIENDS OF RICHMOND PARK
Received: On time
HOLLY LODGE CENTRE
Received: On time
Tom Hetherington Trustee 07 August 2018
None on record
Farah Rachlin Trustee 14 April 2016
None on record