CONGO ACTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity has proven records of encouraging self supporting projects ,focusing on the activities of women's groups through micro-credit loans and sewing groups. As from 2017, The Charity's main program was to maintain a primary school in a remote part of the DRC, Congo. In 2018, The Charity achieved the planned rebuilding of the school , and continue to support the teachers and the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTINE LE BUZULLIER | Chair | 16 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rattiros Isyarlar | Trustee | 16 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Nelson | Trustee | 16 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.30k | £12.58k | £21.16k | £18.84k | £12.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.49k | £9.53k | £13.98k | £20.12k | £10.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 9 SEPTEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
(1) FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC HEALTH IN THE DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF CONGO ("THE DRC"); AND (2) FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE DRC AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF CONGO
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 UPPER FANT ROAD
MAIDSTONE
ME16 8BP
- Phone:
- 07874751758
- Email:
- congoaction@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window